E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4084
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6004
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6005
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1559
|
Journal Page: 6004
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6004
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5759
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3560
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Hinojosa
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3526
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2505
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2314
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3878
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1052
|
Journal Page: 3878
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3878
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3877
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Hancock
|
Journal Page: 3877
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3877
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3725
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Lucio
|
Journal Page: 3721
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3721
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Corrected committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Corrected comm. report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 831
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 316
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|