House | 04/06/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1541 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 351 | Journal Page: 1540 |
House | 04/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 922 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/17/2011 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 02/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 404 | |
House | 01/04/2011 | Filed |