E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4010
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5956
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3502
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5208
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1375
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5207
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4762
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2745
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2744
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2717
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1007
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#294
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1582
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2011
|
Recommendations filed with the Speaker
|
|
Journal Page: 700
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
House
|
02/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 406
|
House
|
01/10/2011
|
Transmitted to the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|