Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB554 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Howard of Travis, Rodriguez H.B. No. 554
 (Senate Sponsor - Watson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the civil service status of emergency medical services
 personnel in certain municipalities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 143, Local Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter K to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER K. CIVIL SERVICE STATUS OF EMERGENCY MEDICAL SERVICES
 PERSONNEL IN CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES
 Sec. 143.401.  APPLICABILITY. (a)  This subchapter applies
 only to a municipality:
 (1)  with a population of 460,000 or more that operates
 under a city manager form of government; and
 (2)  that employs emergency medical services personnel
 in a municipal department other than the fire department.
 (b)  In this subchapter, "emergency medical services
 personnel" has the meaning assigned by Section 773.003, Health and
 Safety Code.  The term applies only to an individual certified under
 Chapter 773, Health and Safety Code.
 Sec. 143.402.  ELECTION TO ADOPT OR REPEAL SUBCHAPTER.
 (a)  A municipality may hold an election to adopt or repeal this
 subchapter as provided by this section.
 (b)  If the governing body of the municipality receives a
 petition requesting an election that is signed by a number of
 registered voters who reside in the municipality equal to at least
 10 percent of the number of voters who voted in the most recent
 municipal general election, the governing body shall order an
 election submitting to the voters the question of whether this
 subchapter should be adopted.  The election must be held on the
 first authorized uniform election date prescribed by Chapter 41,
 Election Code, that occurs after the petition is filed and that
 allows sufficient time to comply with other requirements of law.
 (c)  The ballot shall be printed to provide for voting for or
 against the proposition: "Adoption of the emergency medical
 services personnel civil service law." If a majority of the votes
 received in the election favor adoption of this subchapter, the
 governing body shall implement this subchapter.
 (d)  A petition for a subsequent election to be held under
 Subsection (b) may not be filed for at least one year after the date
 of a previous election under that subsection.  To be valid, a
 petition for a subsequent election must contain the signatures of a
 number of registered voters who reside in the municipality equal to
 at least 20 percent of the number of voters who voted in the most
 recent municipal general election.  Any subsequent election must be
 held at the next municipal general election that occurs after the
 petition is filed.
 (e)  If the governing body of a municipality that has
 operated under this subchapter for at least one year receives a
 petition requesting an election to repeal this subchapter that is
 signed by at least 10 percent of the registered voters who reside in
 the municipality, the governing body shall order an election
 submitting to the voters the question of whether this subchapter
 should be repealed.  If a majority of the votes received favor
 repeal of this subchapter, this subchapter is void in that
 municipality.
 Sec. 143.403.  STATUS OF EMPLOYEES IF SUBCHAPTER ADOPTED.
 (a)  Each person who is employed for more than six months as
 emergency medical services personnel serving in a municipality at
 the time this subchapter is adopted in the municipality and who is
 entitled to civil service classification has the status of a civil
 service employee and is not required to take a competitive
 examination to remain in the position the person occupies at the
 time of the adoption.
 (b)  On adoption of this subchapter, the governing body of
 the municipality employing emergency medical services personnel
 shall classify the personnel in accordance with Section 143.021 and
 the duties performed by the personnel.
 (c)  To the extent it can be made applicable, each provision
 of this chapter, including the provisions relating to eligibility
 lists, examinations, promotions, appointments, educational
 incentive pay, longevity or seniority pay, certification pay,
 assignment pay, salary, vacation leave, and disciplinary appeals,
 applies to emergency medical services personnel covered by this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *