H.B. No. 555 AN ACT relating to reportable boating accidents and the penalties for certain boating accidents. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Section 31.105(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is amended to read as follows: (a) The operator of a vessel involved in a collision, accident, or other casualty that results in death or injury to a person or damage to property in excess of an amount set by the commission of not less than $2,000 [$500] shall report to [file with] the department on or before the expiration of 30 days after the incident a full description of the collision, accident, or casualty in accordance with regulations established by the department. SECTION 2. Section 31.132, Parks and Wildlife Code, is amended to read as follows: Sec. 31.132. REPORTING PROCEDURES FOR ENFORCEMENT OFFICERS. A marine safety enforcement officer shall provide to the department on a form prescribed by the department a report of any incident the officer investigates that involves a boating accident, water fatality, or person who allegedly operates a boat while intoxicated. The officer shall provide the report not later than the 15th day after the date the officer initially became aware of the incident [occurred]. SECTION 3. Section 24(g), Water Safety Act (Article 9206, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), as added by Section 1, Chapter 48 (H.B. 146), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975, is repealed. SECTION 4. (a) The Parks and Wildlife Commission shall adopt rules required to implement Section 31.105(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act, not later than December 1, 2011. (b) Section 31.105(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to a report for an accident that occurs on or after January 1, 2012. A report for an accident that occurs before January 1, 2012, is governed by the law in effect at the time of the accident, and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose. SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 555 was passed by the House on April 7, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 555 was passed by the Senate on May 18, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate APPROVED: _____________________ Date _____________________ Governor