Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB555 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Howard of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 555
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 13, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0; May 13, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reportable boating accidents and the penalties for
 certain boating accidents.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 31.105(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The operator of a vessel involved in a collision,
 accident, or other casualty that results in death or injury to a
 person or damage to property in excess of an amount set by the
 commission of not less than $2,000 [$500] shall report to [file
 with] the department on or before the expiration of 30 days after
 the incident a full description of the collision, accident, or
 casualty in accordance with regulations established by the
 department.
 SECTION 2.  Section 31.132, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 31.132.  REPORTING PROCEDURES FOR ENFORCEMENT
 OFFICERS. A marine safety enforcement officer shall provide to the
 department on a form prescribed by the department a report of any
 incident the officer investigates that involves a boating accident,
 water fatality, or person who allegedly operates a boat while
 intoxicated. The officer shall provide the report not later than
 the 15th day after the date the officer initially became aware of
 the incident [occurred].
 SECTION 3.  Section 24(g), Water Safety Act (Article 9206,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), as added by Section 1, Chapter 48
 (H.B. 146), Acts of the 64th Legislature, Regular Session, 1975, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 4.  (a)  The Parks and Wildlife Commission shall
 adopt rules required to implement Section 31.105(a), Parks and
 Wildlife Code, as amended by this Act, not later than December 1,
 2011.
 (b)  Section 31.105(a), Parks and Wildlife Code, as amended
 by this Act, applies only to a report for an accident that occurs on
 or after January 1, 2012. A report for an accident that occurs
 before January 1, 2012, is governed by the law in effect at the time
 of the accident, and the former law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 5.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *