E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2384
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4038
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1123
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4037
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3827
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2244
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Nichols
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2243
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2147
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 870
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1159
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#168
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1158
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1136
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1136
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1136
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 790
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
House
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 409
|
House
|
01/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|