Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB588 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 588
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 17, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to surcharges under the Driver Responsibility Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 708.157(b), Transportation Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The department by rule shall [may] offer a holder of a
 driver's license on which a surcharge has been assessed an
 incentive for compliance with the law and efforts at
 rehabilitation, including a reduction of a surcharge or a decrease
 in the length of an installment plan.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter D, Chapter 708, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 708.159 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.159.  ADVANCE PAYMENT OF SURCHARGES.  (a)  The
 department shall offer an option for a single up-front payment to a
 person who is assessed an annual surcharge under this chapter to
 allow the person to pay in advance the total amount that will be
 owed for the 36-month period for which the surcharge will be
 assessed.
 (b)  Notice under Section 708.151 of an initial surcharge
 imposed under this chapter must notify the driver's license holder
 of:
 (1)  the total amount the person will owe for the
 36-month period for which the surcharge will be assessed; and
 (2)  the availability of the advance payment option
 under this section.
 (c)  If a person makes a single up-front payment under this
 section in the amount specified in the notice under Subsection
 (b)(1) and the person is not, in the 36-month period for which the
 person made the up-front payment, subsequently convicted of an
 offense requiring a surcharge or an increase in the amount due to
 the department, the department is not required to:
 (1)  take any further action under Section 708.053,
 708.102, 708.103, or 708.104, as applicable; or
 (2)  annually notify the person of the assessment of
 the surcharge under Section 708.151.
 SECTION 3.  Section 708.159, Transportation Code, as added
 by this Act, applies to any total surcharge amounts owed by a person
 for a 36-month period under Chapter 708, Transportation Code,
 regardless of whether the initial annual surcharge was assessed
 before, on, or after the effective date of this Act.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *