Senate | 05/09/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2143 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2143 | |
Senate | 05/06/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2050 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2959 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Record vote | RV#734 | Journal Page: 2958 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2958 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2958 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2865 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Subcommittee meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/25/2011 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 412 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 412 | |
House | 01/11/2011 | Filed |