E
|
05/19/2011
|
Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
|
|
|
E
|
05/18/2011
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
|
E
|
05/06/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2047
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 1924
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 3175
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2997
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#776
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 2996
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2654
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 1563
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 1562
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 Gallegos
|
Journal Page: 1510
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1510
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Postponed
|
12:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 1485
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1451
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1451
|
Senate
|
04/28/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1375
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1138
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#386
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1841
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1840
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1827
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#382
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1826
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
2-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 1825
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
3-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
2-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 1820
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
1-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 1811
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1810
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/14/11 2:20 PM
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1809
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#330
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1667
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 931
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Redistricting
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|