House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 7/4/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3794 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3794 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2551 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/18/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 413 | |
House | 02/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 413 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Filed |