House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/10/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 430 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 430 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Filed |