Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB613 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Hopson, Farrar (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 613
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 4, 2011;
 April 7, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; April 13, 2011, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; April 13, 2011, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the unauthorized harvesting of standing timber;
 providing for the imposition of a criminal penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Sections 151.051(a) and (b), Natural Resources
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who harvests standing timber with knowledge
 that the harvesting is without the permission of the owner of the
 standing timber and a person who causes another person to harvest
 standing timber without the permission of the owner of the standing
 timber are jointly and severally liable to the owner for damages in
 an amount equal to the sum of the mill price of the timber harvested
 and all reasonable expenses incurred by the owner as a direct result
 of the unauthorized harvesting [three times the market price of the
 timber harvested without permission].
 (b)  Payment of damages by a person under this section does
 not preclude a prosecution of the person under Section 151.005 or
 151.052.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter B, Chapter 151, Natural Resources
 Code, is amended by adding Section 151.052 to read as follows:
 Sec. 151.052.  CRIMINAL OFFENSE. (a)  A person commits an
 offense if the person:
 (1)  harvests standing timber with knowledge that the
 harvesting is without the permission of the owner of the standing
 timber; or
 (2)  causes another person to harvest standing timber
 without the permission of the owner of the standing timber.
 (b)  An offense under this section is:
 (1)  a state jail felony if it is shown on the trial of
 the offense that the value of the timber harvested is at least $500
 but less than $20,000;
 (2)  a felony of the third degree if it is shown on the
 trial of the offense that the value of the timber harvested is at
 least $20,000 but less than $100,000;
 (3)  a felony of the second degree if it is shown on the
 trial of the offense that the value of the timber harvested is at
 least $100,000 but less than $200,000; or
 (4)  a felony of the first degree if it is shown on the
 trial of the offense that the value of the timber harvested is at
 least $200,000.
 SECTION 3.  The change in law made by Section 151.051,
 Natural Resources Code, as amended by this Act, applies only to the
 unauthorized harvesting of standing timber that occurs on or after
 the effective date of this Act.  The unauthorized harvesting of
 standing timber that occurs before the effective date of this Act is
 subject to the law in effect on the date the unauthorized harvesting
 occurs, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *