E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4219
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2556
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1362
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2212
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#530
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2211
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/26/11 3:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2157
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 430
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 430
|
House
|
01/12/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|