Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2371 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2371 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2315 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3962 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1103 | Journal Page: 3962 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3962 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3962 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3960 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amended | 1-Pickett | Journal Page: 3799 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3799 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1757 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 430 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 430 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Filed |