House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/03/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 01/12/2011 | Filed |