E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6459 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4373 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6275 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6284 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5747 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3531 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3531 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3531 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3531 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3531 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3531 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3531 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2976 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2656 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1276 | |
Senate | 04/07/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 976 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1515 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Record vote | RV#276 | Journal Page: 1514 |
House | 04/06/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1514 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1514 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1494 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1072 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 431 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Filed |