House | 05/06/2011 | Corrected comm. rept. sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 05/06/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 3202 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/11/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Subcommittee members named | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety | Journal Page: 432 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 432 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Filed |