Senate | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1295 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#474 | Journal Page: 2047 |
House | 04/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2047 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2046 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1978 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1978 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/01/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1374 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Business & Industry | Journal Page: 433 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 433 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Filed |