House | 05/09/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3527 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 433 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 433 | |
House | 01/13/2011 | Filed |