Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB692 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Farias (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 692
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to high school graduation requirements for a student who
 is unable to participate in physical activity due to disability or
 illness.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 28.025, Education Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (b-1) and adding Subsection (b-11) to read as
 follows:
 (b-1)  The State Board of Education by rule shall require
 that:
 (1)  except as provided by Subsection (b-2), the
 curriculum requirements for the recommended and advanced high
 school programs under Subsection (a) include a requirement that
 students successfully complete:
 (A)  four credits in each subject of the
 foundation curriculum under Section 28.002(a)(1), including at
 least one-half credit in government and at least one-half credit in
 economics to meet the social studies requirement;
 (B)  for the recommended high school program, two
 credits in the same language in a language other than English under
 Section 28.002(a)(2)(A) and, for the advanced high school program,
 three credits in the same language in a language other than English
 under Section 28.002(a)(2)(A); and
 (C)  for the recommended high school program, six
 elective credits and, for the advanced high school program, five
 elective credits;
 (2)  one or more credits offered in the required
 curriculum for the recommended and advanced high school programs
 include a research writing component; and
 (3)  the curriculum requirements for the minimum,
 recommended, and advanced high school programs under Subsection (a)
 include a requirement that students successfully complete:
 (A)  one credit in fine arts under Section
 28.002(a)(2)(D); and
 (B)  except as provided by Subsection (b-11), one
 credit in physical education under Section 28.002(a)(2)(C).
 (b-11)  In adopting rules under Subsection (b-1), the State
 Board of Education shall allow a student who is unable to
 participate in physical activity due to disability or illness to
 substitute one credit in English language arts, mathematics,
 science, or social studies or one academic elective credit for the
 physical education credit required under Subsection (b-1)(3)(B). A
 credit allowed to be substituted under this subsection may not also
 be used by the student to satisfy a graduation requirement other
 than completion of the physical education credit. The rules must
 provide that the determination regarding a student's ability to
 participate in physical activity will be made by:
 (1)  if the student receives special education services
 under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, the student's admission, review,
 and dismissal committee;
 (2)  if the student does not receive special education
 services under Subchapter A, Chapter 29, but is covered by Section
 504, Rehabilitation Act of 1973 (29 U.S.C. Section 794), the
 committee established for the student under that Act; or
 (3)  if each of the committees described by
 Subdivisions (1) and (2) is inapplicable, a committee established
 by the school district of persons with appropriate knowledge
 regarding the student.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *