House | 04/14/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 435 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 435 | |
House | 01/18/2011 | Filed |