E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/20/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 4766
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4181
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4100
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4101
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1141
|
Journal Page: 4100
|
House
|
05/17/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4100
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3650
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2214
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2213
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2193
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1746
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1760
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
Senate
|
04/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
Senate
|
04/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 944
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1546
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#267
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1489
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1469
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#264
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 1468
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Postponed
|
4/4/11 8:30 AM
|
Journal Page: 1137
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1136
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
House
|
02/21/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 437
|
House
|
01/19/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|