Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2316 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1103 | Journal Page: 3963 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3963 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3963 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 3960 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3814 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3814 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Corrected committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Corrected comm. report distributed | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Corrected com rept filed w/ Comte Coordinator | Journal Page: 1098 | |
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 831 | |
House | 03/07/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/21/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 02/21/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 437 | |
House | 01/19/2011 | Filed |