Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1276
|
Senate
|
04/18/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1138
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1909
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1798
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#375
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1799
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1782
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 1561
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1151
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 457
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 457
|
House
|
01/19/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|