Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2306 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2272 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3687 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#1001 | Journal Page: 3686 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3686 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3686 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3594 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3594 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1228 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/15/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | Journal Page: 458 | |
House | 02/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 458 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Filed |