E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4347
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6184
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1609
|
Journal Page: 6184
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6184
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5748
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3532
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1766
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#699
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2846
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2777
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2006
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 458
|
House
|
01/20/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|