Senate | 05/10/2011 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Record vote | RV#820 | Journal Page: 3136 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3136 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Amended | 1-Gallego | Journal Page: 3136 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3136 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 2:05 PM | Journal Page: 3129 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3129 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3083 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3083 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2551 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 459 | |
House | 02/22/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 459 | |
House | 01/20/2011 | Filed |