E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5055
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5070
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6503
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6502
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4585
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5961
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5961
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3915
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3915
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5505
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5505
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5505
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5505
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4615
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 West
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2552
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2143
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2051
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2943
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2924
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2924
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 459
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 459
|
House
|
01/20/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|