Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB755 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Cook (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 755
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 7, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to eligibility of certain dependents for coverage under
 the state employee group benefits program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 1551.004(a), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  In this chapter, "dependent" with respect to an
 individual eligible to participate in the group benefits program
 under Section 1551.101 or 1551.102 means the individual's:
 (1)  spouse;
 (2)  unmarried child younger than 25 years of age;
 (3)  child of any age who the board of trustees
 determines lives with or has the child's care provided by the
 individual on a regular basis if:
 (A)  the child is mentally retarded or physically
 incapacitated to the extent that the child is dependent on the
 individual for care or support, as determined by the board of
 trustees;
 (B)  the child's coverage under this chapter has
 not lapsed; and
 (C)  the child is at least 25 years old and:
 (i)  was enrolled as a participant in the
 health benefits coverage under the group benefits program on the
 date of the child's 25th birthday; or
 (ii)  on the date the individual became
 eligible to participate in the group benefits program, was enrolled
 as the individual's dependent in health benefits coverage under
 Chapter 1575, 1579, or 1601 or in continuation of that dependent
 coverage under the Consolidated Omnibus Budget Reconciliation Act
 of 1985 (Pub. L. No. 99-272) and its subsequent amendments;
 (4)  child of any age who is unmarried, for purposes of
 health benefit coverage under this chapter, on expiration of the
 child's continuation coverage under the Consolidated Omnibus
 Budget Reconciliation Act of 1985 (Pub. L. No. 99-272) and its
 subsequent amendments; and
 (5)  ward, as that term is defined by Section 601, Texas
 Probate Code.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *