E | 06/17/2011 | Effective on 9/1/11 | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6459 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4373 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6275 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6284 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5748 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2612 | |
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/17/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2506 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 05/02/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1630 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1362 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Record vote | RV#516 | Journal Page: 2200 |
House | 04/26/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2200 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2200 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2158 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2158 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Amended | 1-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 2157 |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2157 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1599 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 475 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 475 | |
House | 01/21/2011 | Filed |