Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB790 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kuempel (Senate Sponsor - Hegar) H.B. No. 790
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 May 4, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 20, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 20, 2011, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuing issuance of freshwater fishing stamps by
 the Parks and Wildlife Department.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 43.809, Parks and Wildlife Code, is
 repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *