Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2372
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2316
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3901
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1069
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3900
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3771
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3771
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1034
|
Journal Page: 3770
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3770
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Aliseda
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
2-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Aliseda
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 4, Section 33
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3769
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/12/11 2:10 PM
|
Journal Page: 3708
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 8, Section 5(b)
|
Journal Page: 3708
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/11/11 5:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3564
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3564
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/10/11 9:30 PM
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3407
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 477
|
House
|
01/21/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|