Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB822 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R4593 SLB-D
 By: Farrar H.B. No. 822


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to reducing mercury emissions from electric generating
 facilities; providing for an administrative penalty.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 382, Health and Safety Code, is amended
 by adding Subchapter L to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER L. MERCURY EMISSIONS REDUCTIONS REQUIRED
 FOR ELECTRIC GENERATING FACILITIES
 Sec. 382.551.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Annual emissions period" means the period from
 May 1 of each year to April 30 of the following year.
 (2)  "Electric generating facility" means a facility
 located in this state that generates electric energy for
 compensation, including a facility owned or operated by a municipal
 corporation, electric cooperative, or river authority.
 Sec. 382.552.  AUTHORITY TO REDUCE AIR CONTAMINANT
 EMISSIONS. This subchapter does not limit the authority of the
 commission to require reductions of emissions of any air
 contaminant from any electric generating facility or class of
 electric generating facilities.
 Sec. 382.553.  MERCURY EMISSIONS REDUCTIONS. (a)  For each
 annual emissions period, the total annual emissions of mercury and
 mercury compounds from each electric generating facility may not
 exceed 10 percent of the facility's total emissions of mercury and
 mercury compounds during 2002, as reported to the commission.
 (b)  For an electric generating facility that was not in
 operation for all or any part of 2002 or that was not operating at
 full capacity for a period during that year, the commission may
 impose for the facility a maximum allowable level of emissions of
 mercury and mercury compounds that the commission computes from
 convincing evidence and that corresponds to 10 percent of an
 emissions level the commission estimates the facility would have
 emitted had the facility operated at full capacity throughout that
 year.
 Sec. 382.554.  ENFORCEMENT. (a)  The commission shall
 penalize an electric generating facility that emits in an annual
 emissions period a quantity of mercury or mercury compounds greater
 than that allowed for that period by Section 382.553 and commission
 rules adopted under that section. The commission shall penalize
 the facility by:
 (1)  assessing an administrative penalty, in an amount
 determined by commission rules, for each unit weight of emissions
 of mercury or mercury compounds by which the facility exceeded the
 emissions limitation; and
 (2)  issuing an order reducing the quantity of mercury
 and mercury compounds that the facility may emit in the next annual
 emissions period by a quantity of emissions equal to the excessive
 emissions in the annual emissions period in which the facility
 emitted the excessive quantity of mercury or mercury compounds.
 (b)  In addition to the penalties required by Subsection (a),
 the commission may penalize an electric generating facility that
 emits in an annual emissions period a quantity of mercury or mercury
 compounds greater than that allowed by Section 382.553 and
 commission rules adopted under that section by:
 (1)  ordering the facility to cease operations; or
 (2)  taking other enforcement action provided by
 commission rules.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 39.264(d), (e), and (r), Utilities
 Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (d)  A municipal corporation, electric cooperative, or river
 authority may exclude any electric generating facilities of 25
 megawatts or less from the requirements prescribed by this section.
 Not later than January 1, 2000, a municipal corporation, electric
 cooperative, or river authority must inform the conservation
 commission of its intent to exclude those facilities. An electric
 generating facility excluded under this section is subject to
 Subchapter L, Chapter 382, Health and Safety Code.
 (e)  The owner or operator of an electric generating facility
 shall apply to the conservation commission for a permit for the
 emission of air contaminants on or before September 1, 2000.  A
 permit issued by the conservation commission under this section
 shall require the facility to achieve emissions reductions or
 trading emissions allowances as provided by this section. The
 conservation commission shall amend the permit to require as a
 permit condition that the facility achieve emissions reductions as
 required by Subchapter L, Chapter 382, Health and Safety Code. If
 the facility uses coal as a fuel, the permit must also be
 conditioned on the facility's emissions meeting opacity
 limitations provided by conservation commission rules.
 Notwithstanding Section 382.0518(g), Health and Safety Code, a
 facility that does not obtain a permit as required by this
 subsection may not operate after May 1, 2003, unless the
 conservation commission finds good cause for an extension.
 (r)  [An applicant for a permit under Subsection (e) shall
 publish notice of intent to obtain the permit in accordance with
 Section 382.056, Health and Safety Code. The conservation
 commission shall provide an opportunity for a public hearing and
 the submission of public comment and send notice of a decision on an
 application for a permit under Subsection (e) in the same manner as
 provided by Sections 382.0561 and 382.0562, Health and Safety
 Code.] The conservation commission shall review and renew a permit
 issued under this section in accordance with Section 382.055,
 Health and Safety Code.
 SECTION 3.  (a)  The Texas Commission on Environmental
 Quality shall adopt rules to implement the changes in law made by
 this Act not later than March 1, 2012. The Texas Commission on
 Environmental Quality by rule shall provide for permits and permit
 amendments as necessary for electric generating facilities to meet
 the goals of and for the commission to enforce Subchapter L, Chapter
 382, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, and Section
 39.264, Utilities Code, as amended by this Act.
 (b)  The first annual emissions period to which Subchapter L,
 Chapter 382, Health and Safety Code, as added by this Act, applies
 is the period from May 1, 2013, to April 30, 2014.
 (c)  The amendments to Section 39.264, Utilities Code, made
 by this Act do not apply to a violation of that section committed
 before the effective date of the amendments.  For purposes of this
 subsection, a violation of that section is committed before the
 effective date of the amendments if any element of the violation
 occurs before that date.  A violation committed before the
 effective date of the amendments is covered by Section 39.264,
 Utilities Code, as that section existed on the date on which the
 violation was committed, and the former law is continued in effect
 for that purpose.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.