House | 05/12/2011 | Postponed | 5/12/11 11:35 PM | Journal Page: 3814 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 7, Section 37(a) | Journal Page: 3814 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3814 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3091 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2358 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/25/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 478 | |
House | 02/23/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 478 | |
House | 01/24/2011 | Filed |