Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3548
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1745
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 841
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1228
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1131
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1123
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 941
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
02/23/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 479
|
House
|
01/24/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|