Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB862 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD    Austin, Texas      FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION            March 29, 2011      TO: Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB862 by Patrick, Diane (Relating to placing the State Board of Education and the State Board for Educator Certification under periodic review by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Introduced   Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB862, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($181,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
Austin, Texas
FISCAL NOTE, 82ND LEGISLATIVE REGULAR SESSION
March 29, 2011





  TO: Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education      FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board     IN RE:HB862 by Patrick, Diane (Relating to placing the State Board of Education and the State Board for Educator Certification under periodic review by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Introduced  

TO: Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education
FROM: John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board
IN RE: HB862 by Patrick, Diane (Relating to placing the State Board of Education and the State Board for Educator Certification under periodic review by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Introduced

 Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education 

 Honorable Rob Eissler, Chair, House Committee on Public Education 

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

 John S O'Brien, Director, Legislative Budget Board

HB862 by Patrick, Diane (Relating to placing the State Board of Education and the State Board for Educator Certification under periodic review by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Introduced

HB862 by Patrick, Diane (Relating to placing the State Board of Education and the State Board for Educator Certification under periodic review by the Sunset Advisory Commission.), As Introduced

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB862, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($181,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013. The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill. 

Estimated Two-year Net Impact to General Revenue Related Funds for HB862, As Introduced: a negative impact of ($181,000) through the biennium ending August 31, 2013.

The bill would make no appropriation but could provide the legal basis for an appropriation of funds to implement the provisions of the bill.

General Revenue-Related Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Net Positive/(Negative) Impact to General Revenue Related Funds  2012 ($115,000)   2013 ($66,000)   2014 $0   2015 $0   2016 $0    


2012 ($115,000)
2013 ($66,000)
2014 $0
2015 $0
2016 $0

 All Funds, Five-Year Impact:  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 ($115,000) 2.0   2013 ($66,000) 1.0   2014 $0 0.0   2015 $0 0.0   2016 $0 0.0   

  Fiscal Year Probable Savings/(Cost) fromGeneral Revenue Fund1  Change in Number of State Employees from FY 2011   2012 ($115,000) 2.0   2013 ($66,000) 1.0   2014 $0 0.0   2015 $0 0.0   2016 $0 0.0  


2012 ($115,000) 2.0
2013 ($66,000) 1.0
2014 $0 0.0
2015 $0 0.0
2016 $0 0.0

Fiscal Analysis

The bill would require the Sunset Commission to review the State Board of Education (SBOE), but does not subject SBOE to abolishment.  The first review would be conducted during the period in which state agencies scheduled to be reviewed or abolished in 2013 are reviewed, and every 12th year thereafter.   The bill would also subject the State Board of Educator Certification (SBEC) to Sunset Commission review and abolishment, with a Sunset date of September 1, 2013.  The bill would take effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all members of each house, or September 1, 2011 if it does not receive the two-thirds vote.  

Methodology

The requirement for the Sunset Commission to review SBOE will result in costs to the Commission of approximately $115,000 in fiscal year 2012 and $66,000 in fiscal year 2013.  These costs are related to the equivalent of two additional staff in fiscal year 2012, one additional staff in fiscal year 2013, and other costs related to conducting the review and issuing recommendations, such as report production expenses.  Subjecting SBEC to Sunset review and abolishment would not have a fiscal impact because the Sunset Commission already anticipated reviewing the SBEC policy board and teacher certification program as part of its next review of TEA.  The Texas Education Agency (TEA) anticipates some additional administrative expenses related to the SBOE review; however, these costs are not significant relative to the current administrative budget of the agency.

The requirement for the Sunset Commission to review SBOE will result in costs to the Commission of approximately $115,000 in fiscal year 2012 and $66,000 in fiscal year 2013.  These costs are related to the equivalent of two additional staff in fiscal year 2012, one additional staff in fiscal year 2013, and other costs related to conducting the review and issuing recommendations, such as report production expenses.  Subjecting SBEC to Sunset review and abolishment would not have a fiscal impact because the Sunset Commission already anticipated reviewing the SBEC policy board and teacher certification program as part of its next review of TEA. 

The Texas Education Agency (TEA) anticipates some additional administrative expenses related to the SBOE review; however, these costs are not significant relative to the current administrative budget of the agency.

Local Government Impact

No fiscal implication to units of local government is anticipated.

Source Agencies: 116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 701 Central Education Agency

116 Sunset Advisory Commission, 701 Central Education Agency

LBB Staff: JOB, LXH, JGM

 JOB, LXH, JGM