House | 05/19/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 4210 | |
House | 05/19/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1184 | Journal Page: 4210 |
House | 05/19/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/04/2011 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 700 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 503 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 503 | |
House | 01/26/2011 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 01/25/2011 | Filed |