E | 06/17/2011 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 06/17/2011 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6917 | |
E | 05/27/2011 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6459 | |
Senate | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 4373 | |
House | 05/27/2011 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 6275 | |
House | 05/26/2011 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 6284 | |
House | 05/25/2011 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5748 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Record vote | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 3532 | |
Senate | 05/25/2011 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/21/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2976 | |
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/20/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2656 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 04/29/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1600 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1295 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2048 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Record vote | RV#475 | Journal Page: 2047 |
House | 04/20/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2047 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2047 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1978 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1978 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1978 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 03/28/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 01/26/2011 | Filed |