E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6216
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6216
|
|
05/27/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1619
|
Journal Page: 6217
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6216
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5394
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3445
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3445
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3445
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3444
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3444
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3444
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3444
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Watson
|
Journal Page: 3444
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3444
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3443
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2306
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2303
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1046
|
Journal Page: 3870
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3870
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3870
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Amended
|
2-Branch
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3716
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
House
|
02/22/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 456
|
House
|
02/17/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|