E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6445
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6445
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1666
|
Journal Page: 6445
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6445
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6445
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4620
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5960
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3800
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5712
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5712
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5712
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5390
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Birdwell
|
Journal Page: 3347
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2975
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2655
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1917
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1714
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2694
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#633
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2693
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2645
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Gallego
|
Journal Page: 2643
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2643
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1503
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|