Senate | 04/13/2011 | Referred to Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 04/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1082 | |
Senate | 03/31/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 842 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1228 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1131 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Record vote | RV#163 | Journal Page: 1131 |
House | 03/30/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1131 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1131 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1124 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1124 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 942 | |
House | 03/14/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/07/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 506 | |
House | 01/26/2011 | Filed |