E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3772
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2970
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2808
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4681
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1250
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4680
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Corrected Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4336
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 2609
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Returned from the House for further action
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
House
|
05/18/2011
|
Returned to the Senate for further action
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3965
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2289
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2288
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 994
|
Senate
|
04/07/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 994
|
Senate
|
03/31/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 840
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#163
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1130
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1122
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 922
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Agriculture & Livestock
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
02/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 319
|
House
|
11/08/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|