House | 05/03/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 2663 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB398 | Journal Page: 2663 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Withdrawn from calendar | Journal Page: 2179 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1227 | |
House | 03/22/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/22/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 01/26/2011 | Filed |