House | 05/02/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 01/26/2011 | Filed |