Senate | 05/16/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2372 | |
Senate | 05/16/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2316 | |
House | 05/15/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4063 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3882 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Record vote | RV#1055 | Journal Page: 3881 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3881 | |
House | 05/13/2011 | Amended | 1-Y. Davis | Journal Page: 3881 |
House | 05/13/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3881 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3730 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Amended | 1-Dukes | Journal Page: 3729 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3729 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/20/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/24/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 509 | |
House | 02/24/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 509 | |
House | 01/26/2011 | Filed |