Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB960 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Turner (Senate Sponsor - Whitmire) H.B. No. 960
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 10, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the powers of the Central Harris County Regional Water
 Authority.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 8815.101(b), Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (b)  The following laws [Sections 49.451-49.455, Water
 Code,] do not apply to the authority:
 (1)  Chapter 36, Water Code;
 (2)  Section 49.052, Water Code; and
 (3)  Sections 49.451-49.455, Water Code.
 SECTION 2.  The heading to Section 8815.107, Special
 District Local Laws Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 8815.107.  ADMINISTRATIVE PENALTY; CIVIL ACTION;
 INJUNCTION.
 SECTION 3.  Section 8815.107, Special District Local Laws
 Code, is amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection
 (e) to read as follows:
 (b)  The authority may bring an action in a district court
 against a member district or other district, other political
 subdivision, or other person located in the authority's territory
 or included in the authority's groundwater reduction plan to:
 (1)  recover any fees, rates, charges, assessments,
 collection expenses, attorney's fees, interest, penalties, or
 administrative penalties due the authority; or
 (2)  enforce the authority's rules or orders [to
 recover the penalty in a district court in the county where the
 violation occurred].
 (e)  Governmental immunity from suit or liability of a
 district or other political subdivision is waived for the purposes
 of an action described by this section.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *