House | 05/12/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3801 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 403 | Journal Page: 3800 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/07/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1642 | |
House | 03/29/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/28/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 02/28/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 523 | |
House | 01/27/2011 | Filed |