E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6918
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5116
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5800
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5801
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1522
|
Journal Page: 5800
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5800
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5390
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1339
|
Senate
|
04/20/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1236
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2092
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#427
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1919
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1901
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Hochberg
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1898
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1642
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
01/27/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|