Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB976 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carter, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 976
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 27, 2011;
 May 2, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the issuance of a warrant or summons by a magistrate.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Article 15.03, Code of Criminal Procedure, is
 amended by adding Subsections (c), (d), (e), and (f) to read as
 follows:
 (c)  For purposes of Subdivision 2, Subsection (a), a person
 may appear before the magistrate in person or the person's image may
 be presented to the magistrate through an electronic broadcast
 system.
 (d)  A recording of the communication between the person and
 the magistrate must be made if the person's image is presented
 through an electronic broadcast system under Subsection (c). If
 the defendant is charged with the offense, the recording must be
 preserved until:
 (1)  the defendant is acquitted of the offense; or
 (2)  all appeals relating to the offense have been
 exhausted.
 (e)  The counsel for the defendant may obtain a copy of the
 recording on payment of an amount reasonably necessary to cover the
 costs of reproducing the recording.
 (f)  In this article, "electronic broadcast system" means a
 two-way electronic communication of image and sound between a
 person and magistrate and includes secure Internet
 videoconferencing.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *